HI HB2317 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-08 - Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 417).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-08 - Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 417).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Protects elders and vulnerable adults from financial exploitation in relation to securities. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Securities.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Human Services & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Human Services & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-08 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 417). |
2020-07-08 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2020-07-06 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 595) in amended form (SD 2). |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 07-06-20. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3753) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2020-06-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 06-30-20 9:46AM in conference room 016. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3679) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 06-24-20 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2020-06-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 06-23-20 10:15AM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC/WAM. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 327). |
2020-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 966-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-24 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2020-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-24-20 1:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-14 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from CPC/JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 510-20), recommending referral to FIN. |
2020-02-12 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakashima, Perruso, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-12 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Belatti, Cachola, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa. |
2020-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC/JUD on Wednesday, 02-12-20 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2). |
2020-02-07 | House | Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 232-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC/JUD. |
2020-02-05 | House | The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSH on Wednesday, 02-05-20 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to HSH, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2873 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.