HI HB2281 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Referred to LAB/EDB, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Referred to LAB/EDB, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Preserves the continuity of the Information Technology Steering Committee to properly administer 27-43, Hawaii Revised Statutes, while redefining the composition of the committee.
Title
Relating To Information Technology Steering Committee.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to LAB/EDB, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2837 (Same As) 2020-03-09 - Referred to LAB/EDB, FIN, referral sheet 36
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2281&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB2281_.HTM |