HI HB2265 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Referred to HHH, JHA/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Referred to HHH, JHA/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Decriminalizes the act of engaging in, or agreeing or offering to engage in, sexual conduct with another person in return for a fee or anything of value. Authorizes civil claims to be made against a business, owner or operator of a transient accommodation, or other commercial entity that profits from sexual exploitation. Converts the human trafficking victim services fund to a human trafficking reparations fund.
Title
Relating To Sex Trafficking.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeanne Kapela [D] | Rep. Linda Clark [D] | Rep. Ernesto Ganaden [D] | Rep. Greggor Ilagan [D] |
Rep. Lisa Marten [D] | Rep. Nadine Nakamura [D] | Rep. Amy Perruso [D] | Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to HHH, JHA/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2557 (Same As) 2022-02-08 - The committee on HMS deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2265&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB2265_.HTM |