HI HB2222 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-09 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-09 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the penalty for criminal trespass onto public parks and recreational grounds. Requires law enforcement officers to provide homeless individuals who trespass onto public parks and recreational grounds with information regarding homeless shelters, services, facilities, and safe zones.
Title
Relating To Criminal Trespass.
Sponsors
Rep. Cedric Gates [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] |
Rep. Daniel Holt [D] | Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-09 | House | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2018-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 02-09-18 10:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to WAL, JUD, referral sheet 8 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2481 (Same As) 2018-01-24 - Referred to HMS/PSM/WTL, JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2222&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB2222_.HTM |