HI HB2221 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - The committee(s) on PBS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - The committee(s) on PBS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires courts to order any person charged with a criminal offense to be released on personal recognizance or on the execution of an unsecured bond, unless the person is unlikely to appear for trial. Requires the Judiciary to establish statewide court appearance reminder system. Establishes requirements for any pretrial risk assessment tool used by the Judiciary.
Title
Relating To Pretrial Release.
Sponsors
Rep. Cedric Gates [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Daniel Holt [D] |
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] | Rep. Nadine Nakamura [D] | Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] |
Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | House | The committee(s) on PBS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2018-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 02-01-18 10:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to PBS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 8 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2860 (Same As) 2018-01-30 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2221&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB2221_.HTM |