HI HB2207 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-26 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-26 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the office of planning to conduct a land use study for Hauula, Oahu, that assesses the viability and cost of maintaining the transit corridor. Appropriates funds. Takes effect on 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Land Use.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. David Tarnas [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-26 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3684) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Nishihara. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-20 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 187). |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 852-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-20 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Nakamura; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-20-20 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-14 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 488-20), recommending referral to FIN. |
2020-02-12 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 02-12-20 10:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2020-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WLH with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Saiki excused (2). |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 96-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WLH. |
2020-01-31 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Matayoshi, Woodson, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem. |
2020-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 01-31-20 10:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to TRN, WLH, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Coastal Zone Management
Land Use Study
Office of Planning
State Highways
Transportation
Coastal Zone Management
Land Use Study
Office of Planning
State Highways
Transportation