HI HB2204 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Act 128, on 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1229).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Act 128, on 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1229).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Human Services to reestablish the Exit and Retention Bonus Program to encourage welfare recipients to transition back into the workforce. Appropriates funds. (HB2204 CD1)
Title
Relating To Human Services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-10 | House | Act 128, on 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1229). |
2018-07-10 | Senate | Act 128, 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1229). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2018-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 54-18). |
2018-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18. |
2018-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 54-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Tokuda, Shimabukuro, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Johanson, Kobayashi, Ichiyama, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-25-18 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2018-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-24-18 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2018-04-20 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-23-18 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2018-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 801). |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Green Chair; Tokuda, Shimabukuro Co-Chairs; Ihara. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, Johanson, Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Ichiyama, Tupola. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 686) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3570) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Kidani. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-18 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Reported from HMS/LBR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3058) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in LBR were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Ihara, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, S. Chang. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Harimoto. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/LBR has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-18 3:15PM in conference room 016. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred to HMS/LBR, WAM. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 85). |
2018-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Yamane excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 811-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-23 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Fukumoto, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Nakamura, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Gates, Lowen, Todd, Tupola, Ward. |
2018-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-23-18 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from HHS/LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 679-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-13 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Evans, Keohokalole, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama. |
2018-02-13 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS/LAB on Tuesday, 02-13-18 8:35AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to HHS/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 8 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |