HI HB2191 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-05 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-05 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an appropriation to fund the State Building Code Council's administrative expenses. Requires the Council to develop plans and strategies to secure long-term dedicated funding for Council operations. Appropriates funds.
Title
Public Safety; State Building Code Council; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2016-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 02-05-16 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2628 (Same As) 2016-02-08 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2191&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB2191_.HTM |