HI HB2132 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a one-time income tax refund for resident taxpayers that shall be refunded to implement the provision of article VII, section 6, of the Constitution of the State of Hawaii.
Title
Relating To Constitutional Tax Refund For Resident Taxpayers..
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3100 (Same As) 2022-02-02 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2132&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB2132_.HTM |