HI HB2125 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Enrolled on July 10 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-07-10 - Transmitted to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Makes various amendments to the State Ethics Code. Repeals exemption from certain financial disclosure requirements granted to members of the Hawaii Correctional System Oversight Commission. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The State Ethics Code.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Labor & Public Employment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-10HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2020-07-10HousePassed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
2020-07-10HouseHouse agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2020-07-08SenateReceived notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 420).
2020-07-08HouseReconsideration of action taken on 07-06-20.
2020-07-06SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 384).
2020-07-06HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2020-07-02HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 560) in amended form (SD 1).
2020-07-02SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2020-06-30Senate48 Hrs. Notice 07-02-20.
2020-06-30SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2020-06-30SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3723) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2020-06-23SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2020-06-19SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 06-23-20 10:00AM in conference room 016.
2020-03-16SenateThe hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
2020-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-20 10:00AM in conference room 016.
2020-03-05SenateReferred to JDC.
2020-03-05SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-03-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 317).
2020-03-03HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2020-02-28HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-03-20.
2020-02-28HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 992-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2020-02-26HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, Nakashima, Perruso, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, McKelvey, Yamane.
2020-02-25HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-26-20 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2020-02-25HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-26-20 at 2:00pm.
2020-02-21HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-25-20 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2020-02-12HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
2020-02-12HouseReported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 361-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2020-02-06HouseThe committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Quinlan; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Yamashita, Matsumoto.
2020-02-03HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 02-06-20 9:10AM in House conference room 309.
2020-01-27HouseReferred to LAB, JUD, referral sheet 5
2020-01-21HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2020-01-17HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback