HI HB2101 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 11:10AM in conference room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 11:10AM in conference room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the board of land and natural resources to appoint the executive director of the Kahoolawe island reserve commission. Deposits a percentage of conveyance tax revenue annually into the Kahoolawe rehabilitation trust fund, up to a maximum amount. Clarifies the purpose of the deposits. Repealed on 6/30/2020, or upon the recognition of a sovereign native Hawaiian governing entity, whichever occurs sooner. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Kahoolawe Rehabilitation Trust Fund; Conveyance Tax; Annual Payments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 11:10AM in conference room 224. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-14 8:45AM in conference room 224. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-21-14 8:45AM in conference room 224. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-17-14 8:45AM in conference room 224. |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 675). |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Solomon Chair; Shimabukuro, Dela Cruz Co-Chairs. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684). |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Hanohano, Evans, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Say, Matsumoto Members. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 676). |
2014-04-10 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2014-04-08 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 600) in amended form (SD 2). |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-14. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3340) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2014-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-14 9:15AM in conference room 211. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Reported from WTL/HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3032) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Galuteria, Dela Cruz, Ihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Galuteria, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hee. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-14 1:00PM in conference room 225. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to WTL/HWN, WAM. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 299). |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 860-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa. |
2014-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-26-14 11:15AM in House conference room 308. |
2014-01-29 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takai excused (1). |
2014-01-29 | House | Reported from OMH/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 17-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-01-27 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Cullen, Hanohano, Kawakami, Say, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Nishimoto, Fale. |
2014-01-27 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Evans, Kawakami, Lowen, Say; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Nishimoto, Fale. |
2014-01-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH/WAL on Monday, 01-27-14 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to OMH/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |