HI HB2083 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-30 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McDermott, Takai, Woodson excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-30 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McDermott, Takai, Woodson excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that HPHA is authorized to contract with private businesses to remove food and green waste from public housing projects. Effective July 1, 2525. (HB2083 HD1)
Title
Hawaii Public Housing Authority; Waste Diversion
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Rida Cabanilla Arakawa [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Marcus Oshiro [D] |
Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] | Rep. Isaac Choy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-30 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McDermott, Takai, Woodson excused (3). |
2014-01-30 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 36-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-01-27 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Woodson, Creagan, Jordan, Morikawa, Oshiro; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Carroll, Kobayashi, Matsumoto. |
2014-01-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Monday, 01-27-14 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2509 (Same As) 2014-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.