HI HB2049 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Referred to EDU/LBR, WAM.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Referred to EDU/LBR, WAM.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Board of Education membership by inviting the exclusive representative for bargaining unit (5) (teachers and other personnel of the Department of Education) to appoint a nonvoting public school teacher representative to the Board. (HB2049 HD1)
Title
Relating To The Board Of Education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred to EDU/LBR, WAM. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 178). |
2018-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, San Buenaventura, Say, Yamane excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 950-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, Tupola, Ward. |
2018-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-27-18 12:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Souki, Tupola, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-09 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 218-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-02 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kong, Creagan, Hashem, Learmont, Ohno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, McKelvey, Quinlan. |
2018-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Friday, 02-02-18 2:10PM in House conference room 309. |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2380 (Same As) 2018-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).