HI SB2380 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Board of Education membership by requiring the Board to invite the exclusive representative for Bargaining Unit (5) (teachers and other personnel of the Department of Education) to appoint a nonvoting public school teacher representative to the Board. (SB2380 HD1)
Title
Relating To The Board Of Education.
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] |
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1410-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-03-21 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kong, Hashem, Ing, Learmont, Quinlan, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ohno, Onishi; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, McKelvey. |
2018-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 03-21-18 2:30PM in House conference room 309. |
2018-02-21 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 29 |
2018-02-14 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-02-13 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 19). |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | One Day Notice 02-13-18. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Reported from EDU/LBR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2222) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in LBR were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Taniguchi. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU/LBR has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-18 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Re-Referred to EDU/LBR. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to EDU/LBR, WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2049 (Same As) 2018-03-06 - Referred to EDU/LBR, WAM.