HI HB2043 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Referred to AGR, ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Referred to AGR, ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates an exclusion from income tax for the lesser of a percentage of gross annual income or an amount of gross annual income earned by a farmer from farming activities.
Title
Relating To Farms.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to AGR, ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2353 (Same As) 2022-03-10 - Referred to AGR, ECD, FIN, referral sheet 24
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2043&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB2043_.HTM |