HI HB2042 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-09 - Re-referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 21
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-09 - Re-referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 21
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the Department of Health to establish one full-time position to conduct water quality assessments in West Hawaii island.
Title
Relating To Water Quality.
Sponsors
Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] |
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-09 | House | Re-referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 21 |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to HHS/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2042&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB2042_.HTM |