HI HB2008 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Imposes registration requirements and the transient accommodations tax on travel agencies and tour packagers that enter into arrangements to furnish transient accommodations at noncommissioned negotiated contract rates on their share of the proceeds. Takes effect on 1/1/2050. Applies to taxable years after December 31, 2018. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Onishi [D] | Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Rep. Beth Fukumoto Chang [R] | Rep. Ken Ito [D] |
Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Reported from ETT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3172) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ETT were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Baker, Galuteria, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-18 2:00PM in conference room 414. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred to ETT, WAM. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 62). |
2018-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Say voting no (1) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Yamane excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 875-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-23 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Fukumoto, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Nakamura, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Gates, Lowen, Todd, Tupola, Ward. |
2018-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-23-18 12:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 694-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-13 | House | The committees on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Fukumoto, Cachola, Ito, LoPresti, Ohno, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Choy. |
2018-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TOU on Tuesday, 02-13-18 9:00AM in House conference room 429. |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to TOU, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2697 (Same As) 2018-01-24 - Referred to ETT, WAM.