HI HB1952 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-10 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-10 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a dispute resolution process by which a dispute for a bill for emergency services or a surprise bill may be resolved. Specifies disclosure requirements for health care professionals and health care facilities, including estimated costs for health care services and information on participating provider networks. Specifies that an insured shall not be liable to a health care provider for any sums owed by an insurer. Specifies that an insurer who receives emergency services from a nonparticipating provider shall not incur greater out-of-pocket costs for the emergency services than the insured would have incurred with a participating provider. Specifies additional disclosure requirements for health insurance plans, including payment methodologies and updated participating provider directories. Requires health insurance plans to provide at least one option for coverage for at least eighty per cent of the usual and customary cost of each out-of-network health care service in inadequate network situations.
Title
Insurance; Out-of-Network Providers; Balance Bills; Surprise Bills; Independent Dispute Resolution; Emergency Services; Health Care Providers; Health Care Facilities; Disclosure; Network Adequacy
Sponsors
Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Bertrand Kobayashi [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] |
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-10 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2016-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-10-16 9:30AM in conference room 329. |
2016-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-10-16 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2016-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Monday, 02-08-16 1:45PM in House conference room 329. |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1952&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB1952_.HTM |