HI HB1938 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Referred to EEP/TRN, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Referred to EEP/TRN, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires all state, county, and private bus operators to upgrade to zero emission buses by 2035.
Title
Relating To Climate Change.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to EEP/TRN, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2803 (Same As) 2022-02-18 - Re-Referred to TRS/GVO, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1938&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1938_.HTM |