HI SB2803 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Re-Referred to TRS/GVO, WAM.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Re-Referred to TRS/GVO, WAM.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires all state, county, and private bus operators to upgrade to zero emission buses by 2045. Effective 1/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Climate Change.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | Senate | Re-Referred to TRS/GVO, WAM. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Reported from TRS/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2678) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/WAM. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, DeCoite, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS/GVO deferred the measure until 02-10-22 3:15PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-22 3:15PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to TRS/GVO, CPN/WAM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1938 (Same As) 2022-01-28 - Referred to EEP/TRN, FIN, referral sheet 3