HI HB1921 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires any hunting guide or hunter to obtain and submit to the Department of Land and Natural Resources written permission from any private landowner upon which the hunting guide or hunter is engaged in guide or hunting activities. Requires the Division of Forestry and Wildlife of the Department of Land and Natural Resources to create and make available to the public a written permission form to be completed and filed by any hunting guide or hunter engaged in guide activities or hunting on private lands. Takes effect on 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Hunting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-20 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to WTL, JDC. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 146). |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 924-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-25 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Perruso, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Nakashima, Yamane. |
2020-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-25-20 2:30PM in conference room 325. |
2020-02-24 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-25-20 at 2:30pm. |
2020-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 02-24-20 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1). |
2020-02-10 | House | Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 280-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2020-02-05 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 02-05-20 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred to WLH, JUD, referral sheet 3 |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2373 (Same As) 2020-01-23 - Referred to WTL, JDC.