HI SB2373 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - Referred to WTL, JDC.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - Referred to WTL, JDC.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires any hunting guide or hunter to obtain and submit to the Department of Land and Natural Resources written permission from any private landowner upon which the hunting guide or hunter is engaged in guide or hunting activities. Requires the Division of Forestry and Wildlife of the Department of Land and Natural Resources to create and make available to the public a written permission form to be completed and filed by any hunting guide or hunter engaged in guide activities or hunting on private lands.
Title
Relating To Hunting.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to WTL, JDC. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1921 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2373&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB2373_.HTM |