HI HB192 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits, except for certain limited purposes, the use, transfer, licensing, or sale of a patient's prescription information for any commercial purpose.
Title
Prescription Information; Confidentiality
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Herkes [D] | Rep. Jon Karamatsu [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Blake Oshiro [D] |
Rep. Roy Takumi [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 2 | |
2009-01-23 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-22 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=192&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB192_.HTM |