HI HB1918 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-30 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-30 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Deletes the limitation of agricultural tourism as a permissible use of agricultural land to only counties with not less than 3 islands. Establishes educational retreats as a permissible use within agricultural districts.
Title
Agricultural Land Use; Agricultural Tourism; Educational Retreat
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-30 | House | The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2014-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 01-30-14 9:00AM in conference room 312. |
2014-01-27 | House | The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 01-30-14 at 9:00AM. |
2014-01-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Monday, 01-27-14 9:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to AGR, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1918&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB1918_.HTM |