HI HB1894 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to TIA, WAM.
Pending: Senate Transportation and International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to TIA, WAM.
Pending: Senate Transportation and International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a car-sharing vehicle surcharge tax. Effective July 1, 2030. (HB1894 HD2)
Title
Car-sharing Vehicle Surcharge Tax
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] |
Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to TIA, WAM. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 266). |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, McDermott voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 803-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-20 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson. |
2014-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-20-14 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2014-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Fale, Hanohano, Johanson, Oshiro, Thielen voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Takumi excused (3). |
2014-02-14 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 434-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-02-10 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Takayama, Aquino, Ichiyama, Ing, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Nakashima, Takumi. |
2014-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 02-10-14 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2731 (Same As) 2014-06-23 - Act 110, 6/20/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1211).