HI HB1862 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-21 - Referred to WAL, HSG, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-21 - Referred to WAL, HSG, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Hawaii Community Development Authority to implement affordable-housing policies that are in greater conformity with those of the City and County of Honolulu. Effective July 1, 2014.
Title
Hawaii Community Development Authority; Affordable Housing
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Bertrand Kobayashi [D] |
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Scott Nishimoto [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to WAL, HSG, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2699 (Same As) 2014-03-14 - Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 35
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1862&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB1862_.HTM |