HI HB1810 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Act 186, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1287).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Act 186, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1287).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Defines what constitutes a quorum for the environmental advisory council. Specifies the number of votes required to make any action of the council valid. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Environmental Advisory Council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-27 | House | Act 186, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1287). |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Act 186, 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1287). |
2022-04-21 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 741). |
2022-04-21 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem, McKelvey excused (2). |
2022-04-21 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 733). |
2022-04-20 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-07-22. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 407). |
2022-04-07 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2022-04-06 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 659) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-06-22. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3686) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Lee. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-24-22 10:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3277) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Re-Referred to AEN, JDC. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-14-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to AEN, JDC/WAM. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 269). |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1002-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-03-02 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-02-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-02-22 1:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). |
2022-02-15 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 297-22), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-02-10 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-10-22 9:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2958 (Same As) 2022-01-24 - Referred to AEN, JDC.