HI HB1698 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 10 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-10 - Transmitted to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on July 10 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-10 - Transmitted to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends bargaining unit (14). Retains state law enforcement officers under bargaining unit (14). Creates a separate bargaining unit (15) for state and county ocean safety and water safety officers. Takes effect upon approval. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Collective Bargaining.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House Labor & Public Employment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House Labor & Public Employment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2020-07-10 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration; agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 422). |
2020-07-10 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Ohno excused (2). |
2020-07-10 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2020-07-10 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 07-02-20. |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 379). |
2020-07-02 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2020-07-01 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 554) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 07-01-20. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Reported from LCA/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3716) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, K. Kahele, Fevella. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, S. Chang, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Fevella. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-10-20 11:00AM in conference room 211. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Re-Referred to LCA/WAM. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to LCA, WAM. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 21). |
2020-02-27 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-27 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 753-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-19 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Nakamura, Nishimoto. |
2020-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-19-20 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-03 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say excused (1). |
2020-02-03 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 22-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-01-28 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, Quinlan, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Matsumoto. |
2020-01-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 01-28-20 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2020-01-21 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2020-01-16 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-15 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2251 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 9:00AM in conference room 309.
Subjects
Collective Bargaining
State and County Ocean Safety and Water Safety Officers
State Law Enforcement Officers
State and County Ocean Safety and Water Safety Officers
State Law Enforcement Officers