HI HB1631 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Referred to EDU/HOU, WAM.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Referred to EDU/HOU, WAM.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the School Facilities Authority to work with the Department of Education to prioritize projects for the construction of educator workforce housing that will house teachers and other staff of the Department. Requires the School Facilities Authority to include in its annual report to the Legislature its planned actions toward increasing educator workforce housing. Requires the Department of Education to collaborate with certain state and county agencies to submit a preliminary report to the Legislature on the status of lands designated to be transferred to the Department of Education. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Housing.
Sponsors
Rep. Luke Evslin [D] | Rep. Micah Aiu [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to EDU/HOU, WAM. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 198). |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 871-24), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-26 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran. |
2024-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-26-24 12:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-13 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kila, Takayama excused (2). |
2024-02-13 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 283-24), recommending referral to FIN. |
2024-02-08 | House | The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, La Chica, Kapela, Marten, Martinez, Matayoshi, M. Mizuno, Perruso, Todd, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan. |
2024-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 02-08-24 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-02 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Alcos, Gates, Kila, Nakashima excused (4). |
2024-02-02 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 23-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDN. |
2024-01-31 | House | The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evslin, Kila, Miyake, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Aiu, Onishi; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kitagawa. |
2024-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Wednesday, 01-31-24 10:00AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to HSG, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-16 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2283 (Same As) 2024-01-19 - Referred to EDU/HOU, WAM.