HI HB1552 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-06 - (H) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 049, 5/5/2011, (Gov. Msg. No. 1151).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-06 - (H) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 049, 5/5/2011, (Gov. Msg. No. 1151).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Restricts the use of the geographic origin of Hawaii-grown coffee on coffee labels. (SD2)
Title
Coffee; Labeling Requirements; Trademarks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-06 | (H) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 049, 5/5/2011, (Gov. Msg. No. 1151). | |
2011-05-06 | (S) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 049, 5/5/2011, (Gov. Msg. No. 1151). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 653). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 644). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Thielen excused (2). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) House agrees to Senate amendment(s). | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Nishihara, Chair; Baker, Kahele, Co-Chair(s); Slom. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 585). | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Reconsideration of action taken on 04-14-11. | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 573). | |
2011-04-14 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 591) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1199) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-04-01 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Nishihara, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Green. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 04-01-11 9:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-03-22 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. | |
2011-03-22 | (S) Reported from AGL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 825) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. | |
2011-03-17 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kahele, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Shimabukuro, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi, Slom. | |
2011-03-14 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-11 2:55PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Referred to AGL, CPN. | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 35). | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Ching, C. Lee, McKelvey, Saiki, Takumi excused (6). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 689), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-02-23 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Yamane, Brower, Ito, Keith-Agaran, Luke, B. Oshiro, Tsuji, Ching, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, McKelvey, Morita, Souki, Thielen. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-23-11 2:05PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-02-17 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting no (0) and Chong, Nakashima excused (2). | |
2011-02-17 | (H) Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 406) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | |
2011-02-11 | (H) The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Hashem, Brower, Choy, Evans, McKelvey, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Awana; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Riviere. | |
2011-02-09 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-11-11 9:00AM in House conference room 312. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Referred to AGR, CPC, referral sheet 3 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Passed First Reading |