HI HB155 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB155
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-2)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Health to promptly send personnel to a source, or immediate vicinity of a source, that is reported to have air pollution and conduct an investigation and tests to determine the validity of the report.
Title
Relating To Air Quality.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 02-07-19 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB155 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=155&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB155_.HTM |