HI HB1545 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires bread products that have been baked and then frozen to be labeled "previously frozen". Prohibits bread that has been frozen to be labeled or advertised as "fresh".
Title
Fresh and Frozen Bread Labeling
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-23 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-23-11 2:05PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-02-02 | (H) Re-referred to CPC, referral sheet 8 | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 3 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1545 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB1545_.HTM |