HI HB1529 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1529
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, McDermott, Nakamura, Souki, Todd excused (6).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, McDermott, Nakamura, Souki, Todd excused (6).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits discrimination in the rental of real property based on a veteran's use of HUD-VASH vouchers. (HB1529 HD2)
Title
Relating To Housing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, McDermott, Nakamura, Souki, Todd excused (6). |
2018-02-15 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 486-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to JUD. |
2018-02-08 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Nakamura, Aquino, Hashem, San Buenaventura, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan. |
2018-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 02-08-18 9:30AM in House conference room 423. |
2018-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HSG with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki, Todd excused (2). |
2018-02-05 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 40-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HSG. |
2018-02-01 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) LoPresti, Fukumoto, Cachola, Choy, Ito, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2018-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Thursday, 02-01-18 10:00AM in House conference room 429. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-09 | House | The committee(s) on VMI recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-09-17 9:30AM in conference room 429. |
2017-02-02 | House | The committee(s) on VMI recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Thursday, 02-02-17 9:30AM in House conference room 429. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to VMI, HSG, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1529 (Carry Over) 2017-02-09 - The committee(s) on VMI recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.