HI HB1529 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, Nakashima, Souki excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, Nakashima, Souki excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the establishment of public employee collective bargaining units not already specifically authorized in law. Allows part-time and full-time graduate student assistants employed by UH to collectively bargain their wages, hours, and other terms; provided that no collective bargaining agreement shall take effect prior to 7/1/2017. Requires UH and the relevant exclusive representatives to meet and report to the Legislature. (HB1529 HD1)
Title
Collective Bargaining Units; UH Graduate Students
Sponsors
Rep. Isaac Choy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-18 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, Nakashima, Souki excused (3). |
2016-02-18 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 417-16), recommending referral to FIN. |
2016-02-09 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Ito, Kong, Ohno, Say, Takumi, Tsuji, Matsumoto, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Ing. |
2016-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 02-09-16 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2016-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HED with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say excused (1). |
2016-02-05 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 41-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HED. |
2016-02-02 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takumi, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Tupola; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Har. |
2016-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-02-16 9:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to LAB, HED, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2016-01-20 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-13 | House | Prefiled. |