HI HB1516 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits as an unfair and deceptive practice the advertisement of a good or service in the absence of licenses or permits for the good or service, to the extent the licenses or permits are required by applicable state and county laws. Effective 1/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Regulation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | Senate | The committee on CPN deferred the measure. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to CPN, JDC. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 113). |
2022-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 832-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt. |
2022-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-28-22 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-17 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2022-02-17 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 484-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2022-02-11 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa. |
2022-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Friday, 02-11-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, McDermott excused (2). |
2022-02-09 | House | Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 110-22), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2022-02-02 | House | The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. |
2022-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 02-02-22 10:00AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to ECD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2022-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-18 | House | Prefiled. |