HI HB1498 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-04 - Referred to JDL.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-04 - Referred to JDL.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits urination or defecation on paved roads or sidewalks.
Title
Public Order; Urination and Defecation
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 9). |
2014-01-30 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Cachola, McKelvey, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Awana, Carroll, Fale, Hanohano, Har, Jordan, Oshiro, Takayama, Tokioka voting no (9) and Representative(s) McDermott, Takai, Thielen, Woodson excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-01-29 | House | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Awana, Evans, Fale, Hanohano, Har, Jordan, McKelvey, Oshiro voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takai excused (1). |
2014-01-29 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 24-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2014-01-24 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Ito, Kawakami, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Har, C. Lee, Nakashima, Wooley, McDermott, Thielen. |
2014-01-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 01-24-14 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-01-15 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 1 |
2014-01-15 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2014-01-08 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
SB2503 (Same As) 2014-01-21 - Referred to JDL.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1498&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB1498_.HTM |