HI HB1458 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies acceptable procedure for initiating criminal complaints.
Title
Relating To Criminal Complaints.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2022-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-18 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2083 (Same As) 2022-01-21 - Referred to JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1458&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1458_.HTM |