HI HB1458 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-09 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-09 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows autonomous motor vehicles to be operated on any road, street, or highway if certain requirements are met. Allows for manufacturer testing of autonomous motor vehicles on any road, street, or highway.
Title
Autonomous Motor Vehicles; Department of Transportation; Testing; Operation and Licensing; Retail Sales
Sponsors
Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Scott Nishimoto [D] |
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-09 | House | The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2015-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 02-09-15 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to TRN, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1458&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HB1458_.HTM |