HI HB1446 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-05 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on HED with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Har, Oshiro, Takumi excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-05 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on HED with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Har, Oshiro, Takumi excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an appropriation to the University of Hawaii at Hilo to support Ka Haka Ula O Keelikolani college of Hawaiian language and student support programs at the University of Hawaii at Hilo to support native Hawaiians and native Hawaiian programs.
Title
University of Hawaii at Hilo; Hawaiian Language; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on HED with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Har, Oshiro, Takumi excused (4). |
2013-02-05 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 61), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HED. |
2013-02-01 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Evans, Kawakami, C. Lee, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Coffman. |
2013-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Friday, 02-01-13 8:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to OMH, HED, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |