HI HB1440 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that beginning on 1/1/2026, and each year thereafter, the adjusted minimum wage rate to be recalculated using the most recent self-sufficiency income standard for one adult in the State of Hawaii. Requires that the adjusted minimum wage go into effect starting 7/1/2026 and each year thereafter. Repeals the tip credit.
Title
Relating To The Minimum Wage.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2022-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-18 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2099 (Same As) 2022-01-21 - Referred to LCA, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1440&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1440_.HTM |