HI HB1435 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-24 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-24 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies recommendations of the ignition interlock implementation task force. Allows repeat intoxicated drivers to install ignition interlock devices in any vehicle they operate by eliminating the requirement to surrender motor vehicle registrations and license plates. Makes housekeeping amendments to chapter 291E. Allows persons who have had licenses administratively revoked for a lifetime to be eligible to participate in the ignition interlock program. Extends the expiration date of the ignition interlock implementation task force to 6/30/12. Establishes time frames for installation of ignition interlock devices on motor vehicles for those who have had a lifetime revocation. Applies retroactively to arrests occurring on or after January 1, 2011. (SD1)
Title
Ignition Interlock; Repeat Intoxicated Drivers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-24 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) Reported from TIA/PGM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 929) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. | |
2011-03-21 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PGM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Ryan, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani. | |
2011-03-21 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TIA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Espero, Dela Cruz, Kahele, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kouchi. | |
2011-03-15 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA/PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-11 1:16PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Referred to TIA/PGM, JDL. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 325). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Har, Jordan, Marumoto, McKelvey, Rhoads, Thielen, Ward, Yamane voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ching, Fontaine, Pine voting no (3) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 747), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-01 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Cullen, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Coffman, Har, Marumoto, Ward; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2011-02-25 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-01-11 1:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Marumoto voting no and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 570) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-15 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Cabanilla, Luke, McKelvey, Morita, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Fontaine, Marumoto; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Thielen; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Herkes, Ito. | |
2011-02-11 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-15-11 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-02-10 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2011-02-10 | (H) Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 202) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2011-02-07 | (H) The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Souki, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cullen, M. Lee, Luke, Saiki, Takumi, Yamashita, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2011-02-02 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 02-07-11 9:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB825 (Same As) 2011-02-08 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.