HI SB825 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-08 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-08 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies recommendations of the Hawaii ignition interlock implementation task force. Allows repeat intoxicated drivers to install ignition interlock devices in any vehicle they operate by eliminating the requirement to surrender motor vehicle registrations and license plates. Makes housekeeping amendments to chapter 291E. Extends the expiration date of the ignition interlock implementation task force to 6/30/12. (SD1)
Title
Ignition Interlock; Repeat Intoxicated Drivers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. | |
2011-02-08 | (S) Reported from TIA/PGM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 41) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. | |
2011-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PGM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kidani, Baker, Ryan, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TIA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Espero, Kouchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Gabbard, Kahele. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA/PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-11 2:45PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to TIA/PGM, JDL. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1435 (Same As) 2011-03-24 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.