HI HB141 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB141

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Increases the amount of the fine for campaign spending law violations that may be assessed against a noncandidate committee that makes only independent expenditures and that has received at least one contribution of more than $10,000, or spent more than $10,000, in an election period. Allows the campaign spending commission to order that the payment of a fine, or any portion thereof, assessed against a noncandidate committee be paid from the personal funds of an officer of the noncandidate committee. Effective 7/1/2112. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Violations Of Campaign Finance Law.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-03 - House - House Government Reform: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-08HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and none excused (0).
2021-02-08HouseReported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 36) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
2021-02-03HouseThe committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Cullen, Eli, Ichiyama, Mizuno, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2021-01-29HouseBill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Wednesday, 02-03-21 8:30AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to GVR, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
2021-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-21HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB401 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB141 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and none excused (0).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback