HI HB138 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Act 020, 04/19/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1120).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Act 020, 04/19/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1120).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the State Ethics Commission to establish and administer a lobbyist training course and makes the lobbyist training course mandatory for all lobbyists.
Title
Relating To Mandatory Lobbyist Training.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | Senate | Act 020, 04/19/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1120). |
2023-04-19 | House | Act 020, on 04/19/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1120). |
2023-04-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2023-04-04 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 552). |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-23. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1484) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-23 10:05AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1163) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-09-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 14). |
2023-02-13 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kapela excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2023-02-10 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 286), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2023-02-02 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Holt, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-02-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2023-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-17 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB185 (Same As) 2023-01-23 - Referred to JDC.