HI HB1370 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides statutory authority for the employees' retirement system to make direct payment to a former spouse of a member of benefits or portion thereof pursuant to valid court judgment, order, or decree. Appropriates money to implement the purposes of this Act. Takes effect on 01/01/2016. (SD1)
Title
Employees' Retirement System Benefits; Direct Payment to Former Spouse; Divorce; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-25 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1058) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Gabbard, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-15 9:15AM in conference room 016. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 313). |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Choy, Morikawa voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang, McDermott, Tupola voting no (3) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 836), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-03-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-04-15 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-20 | House | Re-referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2015-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2015-02-10 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 113) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2015-02-06 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Nakashima, Keohokalole, Har, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Takumi, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Aquino, Ichiyama. |
2015-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 02-06-15 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB1324 (Same As) 2015-07-14 - Vetoed on 07/13/2015 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1334).