HI HB1369 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-3)
Status: Passed on June 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-22 - Act 109, 06/22/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1210).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-3)
Status: Passed on June 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-22 - Act 109, 06/22/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1210).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the sunset dates of Act 156, SLH 2012, and Act 124, SLH 2014, to make the nursing facility sustainability program permanent and permanently exempt the nursing sustainability program special fund from the central service and administrative expenses assessments. Makes various amendments to the nursing facility sustainability program and nursing facility sustainability special fund. Repeals the nursing facility tax. Appropriates funds out of the nursing facility sustainability program special fund. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Nursing Facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-28 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-22 | Senate | Act 109, 06/22/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1210). |
2023-06-22 | House | Act 109, on 06/22/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1210). |
2023-05-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2023-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 996). |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 901). |
2023-05-04 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen, Martinez excused (2). |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1) Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Deferred One Day 05-04-23. |
2023-05-02 | House | Deferred one day 05-04-23. |
2023-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-23. |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 139). |
2023-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-02-23. |
2023-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 139) as amended in (CD 1). |
2023-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Lee, Aquino; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Belatti, Morikawa, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 4:30PM in conference room 309. |
2023-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 1:30PM in conference room 329. |
2023-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-27-23 1:30PM in conference room 329. |
2023-04-25 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-26-23 1:30PM in conference room 329. |
2023-04-25 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 978). |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: San Buenaventura Chair; Lee Co-Chair; Aquino. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 839). |
2023-04-21 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, Belatti, Morikawa Co-Chairs; Garcia. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 800). |
2023-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2023-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 866) in amended form (SD 2). |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Keohokalole). Transmitted to House. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-23. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1734) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2023-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-23 10:05AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1142) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2023-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred to HHS, WAM. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 223). |
2023-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Alcos, Matayoshi excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 965), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2023-02-24 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Garrett. |
2023-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-24-23 11:30AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa excused (1). |
2023-02-14 | House | Reported from HUS/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 420) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-02-07 | House | The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Mizuno, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-02-07 | House | The committee on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Amato, Belatti, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Takenouchi, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS/HLT on Tuesday, 02-07-23 8:45AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to HUS/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB314 (Same As) 2023-03-09 - Referred to HUS/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 17
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Department of Human Services
Long-term Care
Nursing Facility Sustainability Fee
Nursing Facility Sustainability Program
Nursing Facility Tax
Repeal
Special Fund
Department of Human Services
Long-term Care
Nursing Facility Sustainability Fee
Nursing Facility Sustainability Program
Nursing Facility Tax
Repeal
Special Fund