HI HB1344 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-18 - (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 2 with none voting no and Representative(s) Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-18 - (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 2 with none voting no and Representative(s) Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the sale of hand-pounded poi by an individual producer directly to consumers under certain conditions. Requires the Department of Health to adopt rules. Effective July 1, 2050. (HB1344 HD2)
Title
Hand-pounded Poi
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Mele Carroll [D] | Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
Rep. Hermina Morita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-18 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 2 with none voting no and Representative(s) Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 487) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to CPC. | |
2011-02-11 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Morikawa, Hanohano, Jordan, C. Lee, Mizuno, Wooley, Ching; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Pine. | |
2011-02-08 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-11-11 9:00AM in House conference room 329. | |
2011-02-07 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HLT with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2011-02-07 | (H) Reported from HAW (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 62) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HLT. | |
2011-02-02 | (H) The committees on HAW recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, C. Lee, Belatti, Jordan, Mizuno, Morikawa, Wooley, Yamane, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Pine. | |
2011-01-31 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HAW on Wednesday, 02-02-11 8:30AM in House conference room 329. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Referred to HAW, HLT, CPC, referral sheet 3 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-25 | (H) Pending introduction. |