HI HB1313 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1313
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends section 329-104(c), Hawaii Revised Statutes, to allow the Department of Public Safety Narcotics Enforcement Division Administrator to disclose, at the Administrator's discretion, confidential information from the Electronic Prescription Accountability System, more commonly known as the Prescription Drug Monitoring Program, to authorized employees of the Department of Health Alcohol and Drug Abuse Division and the Emergency Medical Services and Injury Prevention Systems Branch.
Title
Relating To Electronic Prescription Accountability System.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1313 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 6
SB1486 (Same As) 2019-07-09 - Act 230, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1332).
SB1486 (Same As) 2019-07-09 - Act 230, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1332).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1313&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB1313_.HTM |