HI HB1308 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-08 - Referred to PSM/TIA, JDL.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-08 - Referred to PSM/TIA, JDL.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds civil defense, state law enforcement, and county emergency management vehicles to the definition of "emergency vehicle" under the move over law. Adds a charge of manslaughter as a possible offense when a driver does not move over and kills an emergency responder. (HB1308 HD1)
Title
Emergency Vehicle; Move Over; Civil Defense; Emergency Management
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-08 | Senate | Referred to PSM/TIA, JDL. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 374). |
2013-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Carroll voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-07 | House | Re-referred to PBS/TRN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, Har, Say excused (3). |
2013-02-13 | House | Reported from PBS/TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 401) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2013-02-07 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ing, Takumi, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Nakashima, Yamashita. |
2013-02-07 | House | The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ing, Ichiyama, Takumi, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Nakashima, Yamashita. |
2013-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS/TRN on Thursday, 02-07-13 11:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to PBS/TRN, JUD, referral sheet 7 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |