HI HB1292 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1292
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds a new definition of parked lunch wagons or food trucks to apply in special management areas. Amends the definition of development in a special management area to include placement of any structure. Amends the definition of structure in relation to shoreline setbacks to include parked lunch wagons or food trucks.
Title
Relating To Special Management Areas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to TRN, WAL, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1292 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Referred to TRN, WAL, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1292&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB1292_.HTM |